Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Dominic Murray, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cooktown, Australia

Titular Bishop of Ipsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1847Born
22 Dec 187730.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
29 Mar 189851.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cooktown, Australia
29 Mar 189851.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipsus
3 Jul 189851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ipsus
21 Feb 191467.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Cooktown, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Dominic Murray
Bishop James Dominic Murray O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cooktown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMullingar, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Kilian, Pro-Cathedral, Bendigo

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,662
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast