Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio Cardinal Busca

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1731BornMilano, Italy
20 Aug 177543.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177544.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
17 Sep 177544.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
18 Sep 177544.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
1 Mar 178553.5CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
30 Mar 178957.5Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 178957.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
11 Apr 179159.6AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
27 Feb 179260.4ResignedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the College of Cardinals
18 Dec 179564.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
9 Aug 179664.9AppointedSecretary of State
18 Mar 179765.5ResignedSecretary of State
12 Aug 180371.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Busca (VIAF: 89094318)
Ignazio Cardinal Busca (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 38
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016