Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria Piccolomini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pienza

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1695³BornSiena
23 May 172327.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 174145.5AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
9 Jul 174145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
27 Jan 177276.0ResignedBishop of Pienza, Italy
27 Jan 177276.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
28 Jan 178488.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Piccolomini
Archbishop Francesco Maria Piccolomini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pienza

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1771
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1741, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016