Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement XII

Lorenzo Corsini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1652BornFlorence
10 Apr 169038.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
18 Jun 169038.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
17 May 170654.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170654.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
16 Dec 172068.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
17 Nov 172573.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
12 Jul 173078.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Jul 173078.2InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Feb 174087.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Corsini:
Pope Lorenzo Corsini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 49.6 years
  • a cardinal for 24.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1690, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015