Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Pisanelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1677Born
1693¹15.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
10 Apr 170023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
29 Mar 171941.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
16 Apr 171942.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
25 Dec 173154.7DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Pisanelli
Archbishop Nicolas Pisanelli C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriano

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,728
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 355
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,719, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast