Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Maria Tedeschi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lipari

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1670³BornCatania
10 Mar 171039.4AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
4 May 171039.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
28 Feb 172251.3ResignedBishop of Lipari, Italy
2 Mar 172251.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
29 Sep 174170.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Maria Tedeschi:
Archbishop Nicola Maria Tedeschi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lipari

  • a bishop for 31.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90, and Page 245
  • ob: CB, 2 Mar 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,024
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015