Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Antoine Donadoni, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1668BornVenice
13 Feb 169526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
12 Apr 172354.6AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Apr 172354.7Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
7 Jan 175687.4DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Charles Antoine Donadoni:
Bishop Charles Antoine Donadoni O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015