Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Cardinal d’Escoubleau de Sourdis

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1574Born
3 Mar 159924.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 159924.6AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
21 Dec 159925.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
20 Dec 160026.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
4 Jul 160530.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maillezais, France
30 Jan 160631.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
1615¹40.1ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Maillezais, France
29 Mar 162146.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
13 Oct 162146.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
8 Feb 162853.2DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François d’Escoubleau de Sourdis (VIAF: 30593713)
François Cardinal d’Escoubleau de Sourdis (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtillon-sur-Sèvre
Ordained BishopS.Germain des Près, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Buried Place (Original)Carthusian, Monastery, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
  • a cardinal for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018