Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Daffis

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1586Born
17 Mar 161427.7AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
1 Jun 161427.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
20 Dec 162741.5DiedBishop of Lombez, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Daffis
Bishop Bernard Daffis (born , died ) Bishop of Lombez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Jul 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017