Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Jaubert de Barrault

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornBlaignac
161127.0SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
25 May 161127.3ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
7 Aug 161127.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
20 Jul 163046.5SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
12 May 163147.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
30 Jul 164359.5DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Jaubert de Barrault:
Archbishop Jean Jaubert de Barrault (died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359, and Page 92
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 51, Number 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015