Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthyme Denis de Cohon

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1595Born
24 Jul 163438.8AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
29 Oct 163439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
19 Nov 164449.2AppointedBishop of Dol, France
24 Nov 164853.2ResignedBishop of Dol, France
23 Jul 165559.8SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
27 Aug 165761.9ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
7 Nov 167075.1DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Anthyme Denis de Cohon
Bishop Anthyme Denis de Cohon (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCraon

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 255, and Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018