Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

Dioecesis Nemausensis (-Ucetiensis o Uticensis e Alesiensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nîmes
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Nîmes (erected)
1694Territory LostDiocese of Nîmes Diocese of Alès (Alais) (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Nîmes (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Nîmes
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Avignon Diocese of Nîmes
Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)
27 April 1877Name ChangedDiocese of Nîmes Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès) (from Avignon)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)
1950296,000395,00074.9%4074845565070300289ap1951
1969389,000478,50081.3%335193541,0982866087ap1971
1980405,000494,50081.9%269523211,26197360288ap1981
1990436,000533,00081.8%209442531,72376250303ap1991
1999360,000600,00060.0%154411951,846672178403ap2000
2000365,000623,11558.6%165362011,815656175403ap2001
2001365,000623,11558.6%155321871,951652260403ap2002
2002470,000623,11575.4%141341752,685662286403ap2003
2003368,000629,00058.5%139341732,1278101240403ap2004
2004364,523623,12558.5%135341692,156590274392ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014