Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Henri-Augustin Plantier

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1813Born
20 May 183724.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 185542.5SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
28 Sep 185542.5ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
18 Nov 185542.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
29 Nov 185542.7InstalledBishop of Nîmes, France
25 May 187562.2DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Henri-Augustin Plantier (VIAF: 56742760)
Bishop Claude-Henri-Augustin Plantier (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeyzérieux, Diocese of Belley
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016