Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne-Emile Ramadié

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1812Born
28 May 183623.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Oct 186452.0SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
27 Mar 186552.5ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
6 May 186552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
17 Jan 187663.3SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
26 Jun 187663.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
5 Aug 187663.9InstalledArchbishop of Albi, France
24 Jul 188471.8DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Emile Ramadié (VIAF: 170343599)
Archbishop Etienne-Emile Ramadié (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier
Ordained BishopS. Nazaire, Cathedral, Béziers

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017