Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Antoine-Justin Paulinier

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1815Born
30 Mar 183924.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 187055.1SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
27 Jun 187055.4ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
28 Aug 187055.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
14 Aug 187560.5SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
17 Sep 187560.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
12 Nov 188166.7DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine-Justin Paulinier (VIAF: 89266112)
Archbishop Pierre-Antoine-Justin Paulinier (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePézenas
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Chapel, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 150, and Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017