Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Marie-Achille Ginoulhiac

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1806BornMontpellier
27 Mar 183023.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 185346.1SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
7 Mar 185346.3ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
1 May 185346.4Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
9 Mar 187063.3SelectedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
27 Jun 187063.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
17 Nov 187569.0DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie-Achille Ginoulhiac:
Archbishop Jacques-Marie-Achille Ginoulhiac (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 290, and Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013