Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)

Archidioecesis Senonensis (-Antissiodorensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 3 June 1823
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dijon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,460 (2,881 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-sens-auxerre.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 7 rue Francaise, B.P. 287, 89005 Auxerre CEDEX, France[Ancona], Italian
  • Telephone: 3.86.72.93.93
  • Fax: 3.86.51.75.13

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sens
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Sens (erected)
3rd CenturyElevatedDiocese of Sens
Archdiocese of Sens
3rd CenturyElevatedArchdiocese of Sens
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Sens (suppressed) Diocese of Troyes
Archdiocese of Sens
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Troyes Archdiocese of Sens
Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)
3 June 1823UnitedArchdiocese of Sens Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)
15 August 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre) Territorial Prelature of Mission de France o Pontigny (erected)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre) (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)
1950255,000271,00094.1%237114351726161234503ap1951
1969281,350.0%210953050100320120ap1971
1980201,000303,00066.3%141191601,256184280510ap1981
1990255,000318,00080.2%126171431,783466217110ap1991
1999246,000335,00073.4%100571571,566698139108ap2000
2000240,000331,98772.3%96551511,589687155105ap2001
2001240,000332,56672.2%99541531,568886145116ap2002
2002220,000332,56666.2%91461371,605863157105ap2003
2003200,000332,56660.1%88581461,3691393147104ap2004
2004200,000332,56660.1%87551421,40813112139103ap2005
2010205,700346,00059.5%68581261,6321890116102ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014