Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Viviers

Dioecesis Vivariensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lyon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,556 (2,146 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-ardeche.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 1, 07220 Viviers-sur-Rhone, France
  • Telephone: 4.75.52.64.12
  • Fax: 4.75.52.81.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Viviers (Aps)
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Viviers (Aps) (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Viviers (Aps) (suppressed) Diocese of Mende
Diocese of Viviers
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Mende Diocese of Viviers
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Viviers (from Avignon)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Viviers
1950220,000248,00088.7%46730497442861,600372ap1951
1969220,000257,92785.3%37833411535331,950202ap1971
1980230,000259,00088.8%296296777331,163372ap1981
1990245,000280,00087.5%239683077983104820376ap1991
1999257,000285,70090.0%175452201,168794797368ap2000
2000259,000288,00089.9%172432151,204788760368ap2001
2001261,000290,00090.0%163442071,260790757368ap2002
2002257,423286,02390.0%152471991,293794753368ap2003
2003250,000286,00087.4%145451901,31579070848ap2004
2004250,000286,00087.4%135421771,41278968348ap2005
2010281,220316,22188.9%103361392,023156556924ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013