Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Sortenac

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
Oct 1374³SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
13 Oct 1374ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
20 Dec 1375AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Dec 1375Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 1384³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
17 Aug 1390³DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Sortenac
Pierre Cardinal de Sortenac (died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaraman, Archdiocese of Toulouse, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 14.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 533
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast