Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne

Dioecesis Carcassonensis et Narbonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Carcassonne
533ErectedDiocese of Carcassonne (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Perpignan-Elne (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Alet (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Mirepoix (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Narbonne (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Papoul (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Carcassonne Diocese of Perpignan-Elne (erected)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Carcassonne (from Toulouse)
Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne
14 June 2006Name ChangedDiocese of Carcassonne Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Carcassonne
1950250,000268,88993.0%3042332776443723419ap1951
1959250,000268,88993.0%2741829285650450469ap1960
1969209,000278,32375.1%2352225781322610111ap1971
1980210,700273,00077.2%19519214984219550339ap1981
1990212,000282,00075.2%158181761,204418396339ap1991
1999241,000306,00078.8%120181381,746918356339ap2000
2000243,800309,60078.7%11211132,15781356332ap2002
2002180,000309,95258.1%112271391,294937240339ap2003
2003180,000309,95258.1%99271261,4281034240339ap2004
2004180,000309,95258.1%99271261,4281230215339ap2005
Diocese of Carcassonne et Narbonne
2006181,000311,80058.1%96211171,5471122215339ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014