Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Faucon

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1544AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
20 Oct 1550AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
12 Oct 1551AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
15 Dec 1553AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
22 Sep 1565DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for François de Faucon
Bishop François de Faucon (died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 322
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Sep 2017