Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tulle

Dioecesis Tutelensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Restored: 6 October 1822
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Poitiers
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,896 (2,277 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 19-21 av. de la Bastille, B.P. 79, 19002 Tulle CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.55.26.22.16
  • Fax: 5.55.20.93.69

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tulle
11 July 1317ErectedDiocese of Limoges Diocese of Tulle (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Tulle (suppressed) Diocese of Limoges
Diocese of Tulle
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Limoges Diocese of Tulle
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tulle (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tulle
1950250,000254,60198.2%224162401,04142240293ap1951
1969225,000237,86494.6%191322231,00846237101ap1971
1980229,000244,00093.9%163151781,286424163295ap1981
1990229,000250,00091.6%126151411,624915106296ap1991
1999224,000244,00091.8%102111131,98251394296ap2000
2000225,700245,90091.8%100111112,03351192296ap2001
2001213,000231,81091.9%93201131,88462082296ap2002
2002213,000231,81091.9%88131012,10871583299ap2003
2003213,000231,81091.9%825872,4487577296ap2004
2004213,000231,81091.9%835882,4206576296ap2005
2010219,000241,60090.6%667733,0007966296ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 13 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014