Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hugues Cardinal Roger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Titular See: (never consecrated a bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1293¹Born
18 Jul 134249.5AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
20 Sep 134249.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
20 Sep 134249.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 136370.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugues Roger
Hugues Cardinal Roger O.S.B. (born 1293, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaumont, Diocese of Tulle, France
Death PlaceMotolieu, Monastery, Diocese of Carcassonne, France
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Germain, Church, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges, France

  • a cardinal for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast