Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Limoges

Dioecesis Lemovicensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1st Century
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Poitiers
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 11,085 (4,281 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-limoges.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 3 rue de la Cathedrale, B.P. 93, 87003 Limoges CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.55.34.16.15
  • Fax: 5.55.32.73.37

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Limoges (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Limoges Diocese of Tulle (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Tulle (suppressed) Diocese of Limoges
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Limoges Diocese of Tulle
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Limoges (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950475,000522,44290.9%355173721,27617610480ap1951
1970500,438.0%26425289025524481ap1971
1978424,000505,00084.0%208742821,503194614481ap1981
1990432,000506,00085.4%174432171,990258405117ap1991
1999434,000512,00084.8%123331562,782841292106ap2000
2000437,000516,00084.7%119331522,875743257106ap2001
2001405,000478,40084.7%110281382,934736243106ap2002
2002404,800478,10084.7%107281352,99873622697ap2003
2003465,650475,35098.0%91221134,12062321297ap2004
2004382,690478,36380.0%104221263,03762321497ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014