Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Pierre-Léonard Berteaud

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1798Born
21 Sep 182223.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 184243.5SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
22 Jul 184243.6ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
21 Sep 184243.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
3 Sep 187879.7RetiredBishop of Tulle, France
2 May 187980.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Pierre-Léonard Berteaud (VIAF: 76307065)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Pierre-Léonard Berteaud (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoges
Ordained BishopCathedral, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017