Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Gervais Lacarrière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1808Born
24 Sep 183123.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 185042.0SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
3 Oct 185042.2ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
5 Jan 185142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
30 Dec 185244.5ResignedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
28 Aug 189385.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Gervais Lacarrière
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Gervais Lacarrière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAurillac, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dâme des Neiges, Aurillac

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017