Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Marie Lamouroux de Pompignac

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1802Born
23 Dec 182624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Flour, France
7 Jul 185755.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
3 Aug 185755.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
28 Oct 185755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
23 May 187774.8DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine-Marie Lamouroux de Pompignac (VIAF: 305842696)
Bishop Pierre-Antoine-Marie Lamouroux de Pompignac (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Flour, Diocese of Saint-Flour
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Flour, Diocese of Saint-Flour

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017