Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius VI

Giovanni Angelico Braschi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1717BornCesena
1758¹40.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 177355.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 177355.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
15 Feb 177557.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Feb 177557.1Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Aug 179981.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Angelico Braschi:
Pope Giovanni Angelico Braschi (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Apr 1773
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016