Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Luigi Galletti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1722BornRoma, Italy
10 Jul 174624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Sep 177856.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
4 Oct 177856.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
13 Dec 179068.4DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

MicroData Summary for Pier Luigi Galletti
Bishop Pier Luigi Galletti O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016