Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Maria Calefati

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1726BornBari
27 Mar 175124.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 178154.6SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
17 Sep 178155.2ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
21 Sep 178155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Dec 179367.5DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alexander Maria Calefati:
Bishop Alexander Maria Calefati (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427
  • bp: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015