Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Volpi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1712BornBari, Italy
25 Feb 177663.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Mar 177663.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 177663.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
29 Sep 177663.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Volpi
Archbishop Girolamo Volpi (born ) Titular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 305
  • bp: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016