Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch NicolÚ Saverio Gamboni

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1746Born
23 Jun 177629.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177630.0AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
21 Dec 177630.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
28 Mar 180760.3SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
24 Aug 180760.7ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
21 Oct 180861.8DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Saverio Gamboni
Patriarch NicolÚ Saverio Gamboni (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1776, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018