Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orazio Mattei

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1724BornAvezzano, Italy
9 Jun 175934.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 176743.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
4 Oct 176743.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}

MicroData Summary for Orazio Mattei
Archbishop Orazio Mattei (born ) Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016