Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Maria Odoardi

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1732BornAscoli della Marca
10 Apr 176533.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 177644.0AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
4 Feb 177644.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
2 Feb 180573.0DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Maria Odoardi:
Bishop Alessandro Maria Odoardi (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013