Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Antonio Marcucci

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1717Born
25 Feb 174123.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 177052.6AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
15 Aug 177052.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
19 Jan 177456.1AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
10 Dec 178164.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
12 Apr 178668.3ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
12 Jul 179880.6DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Marcucci
Patriarch Francesco Antonio Marcucci (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForce

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 180, and Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 33
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast