Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Fracchia

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Sep 1778AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
26 Sep 1778AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
27 Sep 1778Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
21 Oct 1795DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Fracchia
Bishop Francesco Antonio Fracchia (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 402, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 26
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1790, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016