Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Maria Pecori (d’Ameno), O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1781AppointedVicar Apostolic of Smirne, Turkey
23 Sep 1788AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
23 Sep 1788AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
7 Jun 1789Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
21 Oct 1795SucceededVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
28 Feb 1796DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Julio Maria Pecori (d’Ameno)
Bishop Julio Maria Pecori (d’Ameno) O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

EventPlace
Ordained BishopConstantinople

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast