Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto

Dioecesis Sancti Benedicti ad Truentum-Ripanus-Montis Alti



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Carlo Bresciani, Bishop
  • Gervasio Gestori, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Fermo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 456 (176 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Marche
  • Official Web Site: http://www.sanbenedettodeltronto.chiesacattolica.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Piazza Sacconi 1, 63039 San Benedetto del Tronto [Ascoli Piceno], Italia
  • Telephone: 0735.58.18.55
  • Fax: 0735.57.94.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ripatransone
1 August 1571ErectedDiocese of Ripatransone (erected)
Diocese of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto
7 April 1983Name ChangedDiocese of Ripatransone Diocese of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto
Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Montalto (delle Marche)
Diocese of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto
Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ripatransone
195058,60958,609100.0%68341025745212522ap1951
197086,45386,72399.7%58461048315622831ap1971
198085,50086,00099.4%5237899605517635ap1981
Diocese of Ripatransone-San Benedetto del Tronto
Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto
1990113,000114,00099.1%73371101,02714317250ap1991
1999120,703123,10398.1%65391041,16054317553ap2000
2000121,770124,19098.1%65391041,17054417653ap2001
2001121,295125,23096.9%61421031,17755815953ap2002
2002121,870126,10096.6%63421051,16055815953ap2003
2003122,130127,20096.0%60421021,19766115853ap2004
2004121,000126,90095.4%59421011,19865415654ap2005
2010130,696137,13595.3%60441041,25695013654ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014