Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Canestrari, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1774BornTerra delle Piaggie
17 Dec 179622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Dec 182551.9AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
21 Dec 182551.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
19 Oct 184672.7DiedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Canestrari:
Bishop Luigi Canestrari O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Montalto (delle Marche)

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013