Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Perugini, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1759Born
10 Nov 178222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
16 May 182363.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
18 May 182363.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
11 Aug 182969.6DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Perugini
Bishop Giuseppe Perugini O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGradoli, Italy

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017