Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Bertazzoli

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1754Born
1777²22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Imola, Italy
24 May 180248.0AppointedSecret Almoner of the Office of Papal Charities
24 May 180248.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
30 May 180248.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
30 Dec 181460.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Studies
10 Mar 182368.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182369.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
28 Aug 182470.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
15 Dec 182874.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
7 Apr 183075.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bertazzoli (VIAF: 30723287)
Francesco Cardinal Bertazzoli (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugo, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained PriestLugo, Diocese of Imola, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Frascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 Jun 2019

Quantcast