Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Fransoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1789BornGenova
11 Dec 181425.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 182031.2SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
13 Aug 182132.3ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
19 Aug 182132.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
7 Feb 183242.8SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
24 Feb 183242.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
26 Mar 186272.9DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Fransoni (VIAF: 12204036)
Archbishop Luigi Fransoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 198, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1821, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016