Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Gastaldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1815Born
23 Sep 183722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
27 Mar 186752.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
2 Jun 186752.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
9 Jun 186752.2InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Oct 187156.6AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
25 Mar 188368.0DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gastaldi (VIAF: 43203480)
Archbishop Lorenzo Gastaldi (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopS. Laurent, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 494, and Page 538
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1867, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017