Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Vassarotti

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1815Born
23 Dec 183722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pinerolo, Italy
22 Dec 187358.6AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
24 Feb 187458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
25 Aug 188166.3DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Vassarotti
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Vassarotti (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastagnole Piemonte, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopChurch of the Martyrs, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1874, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017