Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino Matteo Fissore

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1814Born
17 Dec 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187157.4AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
30 Nov 187157.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
5 Apr 188974.8DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino Matteo Fissore
Archbishop Celestino Matteo Fissore (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrÓ, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,330
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 586
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017