Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Leto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1819Born
21 May 184222.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 187353.8AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
10 Aug 187353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
19 Dec 188566.2ResignedBishop of Biella, Italy
15 Jan 188666.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
15 Feb 189676.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Basilio Leto (VIAF: 89176694)
Bishop Basilio Leto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassarano, Archdiocese of Vercelli
Ordained BishopVercelli, Archdiocese of Vercelli

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 162, and Page 496
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1873, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017