Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Maria Davide Eugenio Felice Riccardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1833Born
17 May 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
15 Jul 187844.8AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
15 Aug 187844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
7 Jun 188652.7AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
14 Dec 189158.3AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
20 May 189763.7DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Davide Eugenio Felice Riccardi (VIAF: 89353609)
Archbishop Giovanni Maria Davide Eugenio Felice Riccardi (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella, Diocese of Biella
Ordained PriestBiella, Diocese of Biella
Ordained BishopBiella, Diocese of Biella
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 324, and Page 420
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 538
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1897
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1878, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017