Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Filippo Cardinal Fransoni

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1775BornGenoa, Italy
14 Mar 180731.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 182246.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
8 Dec 182247.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
21 Jan 182347.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
2 Oct 182650.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
2 Oct 182650.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 183458.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
28 Sep 185579.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Apr 185680.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Filippo Fransoni:
Giacomo Filippo Cardinal Fransoni (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
  • a cardinal for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014