Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Carletti

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1805BornFerrara
17 Oct 183025.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 184540.1AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
4 May 184540.2Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
28 Sep 184944.6AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
26 Jul 186762.4DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Carletti (VIAF: 88824864)
Bishop Gaetano Carletti (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 477
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016