Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Indianapolis

Archidioecesis Indianapolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph William Tobin, C.SS.R., Archbishop
  • Christopher James Coyne, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Daniel Mark Buechlein, O.S.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 October 1944
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Indiana
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 35,768 (13,815 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: IND
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archindy.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 1410, Indianapolis, IN 46206-1410; 1400 N. Meridian St., Indianapolis, IN 46202-2367, USA
  • Telephone: (317)236-1405
  • Fax: 236-1406

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Vincennes
6 May 1834ErectedDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Vincennes (erected) (Indiana and the eastern portion of Illinois)
28 November 1843Territory LostDiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Vincennes
Diocese of Chicago (erected) (State of Illinois)
8 January 1857Territory LostDiocese of Vincennes Diocese of Fort Wayne (erected)
Diocese of Indianapolis
28 March 1898Name ChangedDiocese of Vincennes Diocese of Indianapolis
21 October 1944Territory LostDiocese of Indianapolis Diocese of Evansville (erected)
Archdiocese of Indianapolis
21 October 1944ElevatedDiocese of Indianapolis Archdiocese of Indianapolis

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vincennes
Diocese of Indianapolis
Archdiocese of Indianapolis
1950125,0001,505,5278.3%2291693983142232,370151ap1951
1966203,4651,783,56211.4%2681904584443352,544164ap1967
1970207,9671,783,56211.7%2711844554572942,583145ap1971
1976202,9652,022,36610.0%2472478211591,620144ap1977
1980202,0872,078,0009.7%2201723925153171,913142ap1981
1990202,6952,312,2008.8%179121300675216806159ap1991
1999217,8862,201,5039.9%16711328077858784138ap2000
2000220,3022,359,1049.3%162105267825173776138ap2001
2001227,5012,422,1039.4%157191761,292170764139ap2002
2002233,1712,430,6669.6%157102259900163731139ap2003
2003229,4822,430,6669.4%163106269853158725139ap2004
2004230,9382,430,6069.5%159113272849166757139ap2005
2006236,0002,477,0009.5%1561052619041144700139ap2007
2010244,0002,573,0009.5%15491245995129658151ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013